skip to content

Chen, Hing Kai

CPSO#: 29149

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Dec 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 14 Dec 2008
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 21 Oct 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Dec 2008

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Executive Committee
Active Date: December 14, 2008
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Hing Kai Chen undertakes to resign effective December 14, 2008, and not to apply or re-apply as a physician or for a license to prastise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.