skip to content

Chen, Anthony Chi-Fu

CPSO#: 93777

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Church Wellesley Health Centre
491 Church Street, Suite 200
Toronto ON  M4Y 2C6
Phone: (416) 463-1500
Fax: (416) 463-6577 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Anthony C.F. Chen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chen ( CPSO# 93777 )

Business Address:
Church Wellesley Health Centre
200 - 491 Church Street
Toronto ON  M4Y 2C6
Phone Number: (416) 463-6929

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANTHONY CHI-FU CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012