skip to content

Chemparathy, Joseph Varghese

CPSO#: 87794

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Dec 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 31 May 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malayalam

Education:University of Calcutta, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Upper Appleby Medical Associates
Suite 34
1960 Appleby Line
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Phone: (905) 315-9929
Fax: (905) 315-9314 Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 23 Oct 2007 to 07 Jan 2008
AVP - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 08 Jan 2008 to 22 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Oct 2008 to 19 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2009
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 May 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 04 Jun 2021 Active
 As from May 31, 2021, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Joseph Varghese Chemparathy in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Chemparathy to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT

("Undertaking") of

DR. JOSEPH VARGHESE CHEMPARATHY

("Dr. Chemparathy") to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO

(the "College")


A.	PREAMBLE

(1)	In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the
Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended; "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public.
(2)	I, Dr. Chemparathy, certificate of registration number 87794, am a member of the College.

(3)	I, Dr. Chemparathy, acknowledge that following a public complaint, the College conducted an investigation bearing File Number 1115146 (the "Investigation") into my care of a patient in my family practice whether I engaged in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent.

B.	UNDERTAKING

(4)	I, Dr. Chemparathy, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(5)	Professional Education

(a)	I, Dr. Chemparathy, undertake to participate in and successfully complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "A", including all of the following professional education (the "Professional Education"):

(i)	Review, reflection, and a written summary of the following policies and other self-study:

1.	A Sensitive, Deliberate Approach to Draping, eDialogue October 2019, CPSO:
 
https://dialogue.cpso.on.ca/2019/10/a-sensitive-deliberate-approach-to- draping/

2.	The pediatric physical examination: The perineum and abdomen, UpToDate: (with a focus on the rectal, anus and abdominal examination)
www.uptodate.com/contents/the-pediatric-physical-examination-the- perineum?search=communicating%20about%20digital%20rectal%20e xamins%20in%20pediatrics&source=search_result&selectedTitle=1~ 150&usage_type=default&display_rank=1

3.	The pediatric physical examination: Chest and abdomen, UpToDate: (with a focus on the rectal, anus and abdominal examination) www.uptodate.com/contents/the-pediatric-physical-examination-
chest-and- abdomen?search=pedicatric%20examination&source=search_result&s electedTitle=5~150&usage_type=default&display_rank=5

4.	Consent to Treatment, CPSO: www.cpso.on.ca/Physicians/Policies- Guidance/Policies/Consent-to-Treatment

5.	Individualized instruction in communication satisfactory to the College, with an instructor selected by the College.

(b)	I, Dr. Chemparathy, undertake to provide proof to the College of my successful completion of the Professional Education, including proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional Education.

(c)	I, Dr. Chemparathy, undertake to complete this requirement within six months, or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, by the first possible opportunity thereafter.

(d)	I, Dr. Chemparathy, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the Professional Education.

(e)	I, Dr. Chemparathy, acknowledge that if any of the programs listed above become unavailable, substitution requests will be reviewed by the College and the College will determine in its sole discretion whether substitution is appropriate.

C.	ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(6)	I, Dr. Chemparathy, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.
 
(7)	I, Dr. Chemparathy, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(8)	I, Dr. Chemparathy, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(9)	I, Dr. Chemparathy, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

(10)	I, Dr. Chemparathy, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the College.

(11)	I, Dr. Chemparathy, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(12)	Public Register

(a)	I, Dr. Chemparathy, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b)	I, Dr. Chemparathy, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (12)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Following a public complaint, the College investigation was conducted into Dr. Chemparathy care of a patient in his family practice. As a result of the investigation Dr. Chemparathy will engage in professional education in communication and pediatric physician examination.

(c)	I, Dr. Chemparathy, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.

D.	CONSENT

(13)	I, Dr. Chemparathy, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who requires this information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education:

(a)	any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;
 
(b)	any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and

(c)	any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(14)	I, Dr. Chemparathy, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(15)	I, Dr. Chemparathy, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Chiefs of Staff, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

(a)	any information relevant to this Undertaking;

(b)	any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking;

(c)	any information which comes to their attention in the course of providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.


Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: May 31, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Joseph Varghese Chemparathy to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 31, 2021:

Following a public complaint, the College investigation was conducted into Dr. Chemparathy care of a patient in his family practice. As a result of the investigation Dr. Chemparathy will engage in professional education in communication and pediatric physician examination.