skip to content

Cheetham, Thomas Charles

CPSO#: 31756

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of 20 Aug 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 20 Aug 2018

Summary

Date of Death: 20-Aug-2018

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Tennessee

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1980
Expired: Member deceased. Expiry date: 20 Aug 2018