skip to content

Che, Priscilla May

CPSO#: 90772

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 108
625 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M4M 1G7
Phone: (647) 479-8410
Fax: (647) 689-2859 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Priscilla Che Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 06 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Che ( CPSO# 90772 )

Business Address:
Unit 108
625 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M4M 1G7
Phone Number: (647) 479-8410

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PRISCILLA MAY CHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011