skip to content

Chbat, Tarek

CPSO#: 96226

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Jul 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Department of Anesthesia
100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: 905-848-7100 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Tarek Chbat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 14 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Chbat ( CPSO# 96226 )

Business Address:
103 - 20 Wynford Drive
Toronto ON  M3C 1J4
Phone Number: (416) 441-2111

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
200 James Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 3A9
Phone Number: (905) 525-8607


Corporation Name: Drs Adam, Goyal, Chbat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Chbat ( CPSO# 96226 )
Dr. A. Adam ( CPSO# 97133 )
Dr. N. Goyal ( CPSO# 101559)

Business Address:
5757 Kennedy Rd
Suite 2
Mississauga ON  L4Z 0C5

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TAREK CHBAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHBAT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2016