skip to content

Chawla, Virendra Singh

CPSO#: 25038

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Aug 1972
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 May 2020
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Rajasthan University, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
204 Hamilton Road
London ON  N5Z 1R1
Phone: (519) 686-7266
Fax: (519) 204-2333 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Chawla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Chawla ( CPSO# 25038 )

Business Address:
204 Hamilton Road
London ON  N5Z 1R1
Phone Number: (519) 686-7266

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VIRENDRA SINGH CHAWLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAWLA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 2020

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: February 27, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)