skip to content

Chawla, Aakriti

CPSO#: 97455

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Oct 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Oct 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Bond University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone: (416) 534-5130 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Aakriti Chawla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chawla ( CPSO# 97455 )

Business Address:
199 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 0E3

Business Address:
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 873-0111

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
725 Bronte Street
Milton ON  L9T 9K1
Phone Number: (905) 878-2383

Business Address:
1A Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 4W4


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AAKRITI CHAWLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAWLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 02 May 2012 to 29 May 2012
EL - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Western University, 30 May 2012 to 22 Jun 2012
EL - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2013