Chavlovski, Anna (CPSO#: 100244)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Loyalist Family Health Team
101-200 Speers Blvd
Amherstview ON  K7N 0B6
Phone: 613-634-1078
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zevin Chavlovski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chavlovski ( CPSO# 100244)
Dr. B. Zevin ( CPSO# 88884 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
18 Manitou Crescent West
Amherstview ON  K7N 1S3
Phone Number: (613) 634-1078

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNA CHAVLOVSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAVLOVSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015