skip to content

Chavarria Viquez, Jorge Andres

CPSO#: 122910

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Oct 2020
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education (Clinical Fellow) as of 28 Oct 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Costa Rica, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Cardiology
237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2 Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JORGE ANDRES CHAVARRIA VIQUEZ may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. CHAVARRIA VIQUEZ is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. CHAVARRIA VIQUEZ shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CHAVARRIA VIQUEZ is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. CHAVARRIA VIQUEZ shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. CHAVARRIA VIQUEZ ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. CHAVARRIA VIQUEZ ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2023.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 28 Oct 2020 to 07 Dec 2020
PEAP - CF - Cardiology

McMaster University, 08 Dec 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
CF - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
CF - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2020
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2023