skip to content

Chauhan, Rameshchandra Popatlal

CPSO#: 23536

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Jun 1971
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Jun 1971

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Gujarati

Education:University of Leeds, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
595 Montreal Road
Suite 202
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone: (613) 746-6745
Fax: (613) 746-6008 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Chauhan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chauhan ( CPSO# 23536 )

Business Address:
595 Montreal Road
Suite 202
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone Number: (613) 746-6745


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:01 Jan 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RAMESHCHANDRA POPATLAL CHAUHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAUHAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1971