skip to content

Chauhan, Nitin

CPSO#: 84878

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
807 Broadview Ave
Albany Medical Clinic
Toronto ON  M4K2P8
Phone: 4164619471 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Main Healthcare
3rd Floor
294 Main Street
Toronto ON  M4C 4X5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Mount Sinai Hospital
Otolaryngology Clinic
Room 401
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1415 Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1P 2L6
Canada
Phone: (647) 748-2999
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

4515 Ebenezer Rd, #114
Brampton ON  L6P2K7
Canada
Phone: 9057999969
Fax: 9057999169
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

4789 Yonge St
North York ON  M2N 0G3
Canada
Phone: 4162219299
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Nitin Chauhan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NITIN CHAUHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAUHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011