skip to content

Chauhan, Amitabh

CPSO#: 93634

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Aug 2017
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education as of 28 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMITABH CHAUHAN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. CHAUHAN is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. CHAUHAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CHAUHAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. CHAUHAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. CHAUHAN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. CHAUHAN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2020.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2020