skip to content

Chaudhry, Sukarno Nawaz

CPSO#: 85486

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Aug 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Islamia University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2475 Dougall Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 1T3
Phone: (519)-252-4448
Fax: (519)-252-4443 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 254-5577
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

33 Princess Street
Leamington ON  N8H 5C5
Canada
Phone: 519-325-1333
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Oshawa Durham Sleep Lab
292 King Street West
Oshawa ON  L1J 2J9
Canada
Phone: (905) 436-6163
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sukarno N. Chaudhry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chaudhry ( CPSO# 85486 )

Business Address:
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Business Address:
2475 Dougall Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 1T3
Phone Number: (519) 252-4448

Business Address:
33 Princess Street
Leamington ON  N8H 5C5
Phone Number: (519) 325-1333

Business Address:
292 King Street West
Oshawa ON  L1J 2J9
Phone Number: (905) 436-6163


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:14 Jun 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:14 Jun 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SUKARNO NAWAZ CHAUDHRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAUDHRY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2006