skip to content

Chaudhry, Muhammad Sabir

CPSO#: 85031

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Jun 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: (905) 494-6481 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. M.S. Chaudhry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 6 2012
Corporation Name: Dr. M.S. Chaudhry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chaudhry ( CPSO# 85031 )

Business Address:
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 494-2120

Business Address:
William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.


Pakistan
USA - Maine

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:02 May 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MUHAMMAD SABIR CHAUDHRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAUDHRY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2006