skip to content

Chaudhry, Harman Preet

CPSO#: 96236

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 319
43 Wellesley Street East
Toronto ON  M4Y 1H1
Phone: 416-967-8778
Fax: 416-967-8780 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Chaudhry & Misra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Chaudhry ( CPSO# 96236 )
Dr. S. Misra ( CPSO# 100947)

Business Address:
43 Wellesley Street East
Suite 319
Toronto ON  M4Y 1H1
Phone Number: (416) 967-8778

Business Address:
7899 McLaughlin Road
Room C210
Brampton ON  L6Y 5H9
Phone Number: (905) 459-7533

Business Address:
325 Central Pkwy W, Unit 21
Mississauga ON  L5B 3X9
Phone Number: 905-270-0587

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:31 Dec 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HARMAN PREET CHAUDHRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAUDHRY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Western University, 01 Aug 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2019 to 31 Jul 2019
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2017