skip to content

Chaturvedi, Prabhat Kumar

CPSO#: 27320

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Jul 1996
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 22 Jul 1996

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Lucknow, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:11 Mar 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Sep 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jul 1996