skip to content

Chatha, Neel-Kamal Kaur

CPSO#: 86945

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 120
1130 Morrison Drive
Ottawa ON  K2H 9N6
Phone: (613) 820-5050
Fax: (613) 820-7831 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: 613-721-2000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Chatha-Kelly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Chatha ( CPSO# 86945 )
Dr. S. Kelly ( CPSO# 88694 )

Business Address:
Unit 120
1130 Morrison Drive
Ottawa ON  K2H 9N6
Phone Number: (613) 820-5050

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4

Business Address:
3161 Strandherd Drive
Suite 305
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Phone Number: (613) 823-5245

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:03 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NEEL-KAMAL KAUR CHATHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHATHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011