Chasse, Michael (CPSO#: 99384)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Apr 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Apr 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 900 rue Saint-Denis Bur. R04.436 Montreal, QC H2X 0A9
Date Received: 05 Apr 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Apr 2017