skip to content

Chasen, Martin Robert

CPSO#: 92146

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English, French

Education:University of Pretoria, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
Division of Palliative Care
2100 Bovaird Drive east
Brampton
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: 905-494-2120 Ext. 50532
Fax: 905-494-6758 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

101 Humber College Boulavard
Etobicoke
Etobicoke ON  M9V1R8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Martin Chasen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 20 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chasen ( CPSO# 92146 )

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec
South Africa
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Oncology Effective:18 Nov 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Palliative Medicine Effective:01 Jul 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARTIN ROBERT CHASEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHASEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2014