skip to content

Chase, Teena Darlene

CPSO#: 97672

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Aug 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 402
2039 Robertson Road
Nepean
Nepean ON  K2H 8R2
Phone: 613 927 9590
Fax: 613 703 7419 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: 613 721 4708
Fax: 613 721 4773
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:16 May 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TEENA DARLENE CHASE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHASE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Feb 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Aug 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2019