skip to content

Duncan, Charles George

CPSO#: 22961

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Jul 1970
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1970
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Birchley Place
209 Hwy 20 East
Fonthill ON  L0S 1E0
Phone: (905) 892-5777
Fax: (905) 892-7539 Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1973 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHARLES GEORGE DUNCAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUNCAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1970

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: August 22, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Charles George Duncan to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 22, 2019:

College Investigations were conducted into whether Dr. Duncan engaged in professional misconduct or is incompetent in his family medicine practice. In the face of these Investigations, Dr. Duncan resigned from the College, effective October 31, 2019, and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)