skip to content

Charles, Biju

CPSO#: 97139

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Kerala, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2012 to 24 Mar 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 25 Mar 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2012