skip to content

Charland, David Andre

CPSO#: 93587

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1245 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Phone: (905) 632-3730 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

310 Juliana Dr
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Canada
Phone: (519) 421-4211
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02

50 Charlton Ave, East
Hamilton ON  L8N4A6
Canada
Phone: (905)522-1155
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: David A. Charland Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Charland ( CPSO# 93587 )

Business Address:
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Medical Records Location

Address: Medica One 2079 Lakeshore Rd Burlington, ON L7R 1E2 Tel: 905-634-1625 Fax: 905-634-5332
Instructions: Patients should contact Medica One to request a copy of their medical record.
Date Received: 05 Jun 2018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID ANDRE CHARLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARLAND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012