Chari, Vinjamuri Madhusudana (CPSO#: 100908)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Firestone Institute for
Respiratory Health
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 22 Oct 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VINJAMURI MADHUSUDANA CHARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017