skip to content

Charette, Yannick Andre

CPSO#: 93258

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Jan 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Jan 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2416 Long Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5H5
Phone: (705) 222-0079
Fax: (705) 523-1414 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

181 Elm street W
Sudbury ON  P3C 1T8
Canada
Phone: (705) 564-4150
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Yannick Charette Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Charette ( CPSO# 93258 )

Business Address:
127 Cedar Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 1B1
Phone Number: (705) 523-4988

Business Address:
2416 Long Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5H5
Phone Number: (705) 222-0079

Business Address:
181 Elm Street West
Sudbury ON  P3C 1T8
Phone Number: (705) 564-4150

Business Address:
1813 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury ON  P3A 2A3
Phone Number: (705) 222-9038

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. YANNICK ANDRE CHARETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARETTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2013