skip to content

Charania, Diamondali Kassamali

CPSO#: 27565

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Jul 1975
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1975
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College of East Africa, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Glendale Medical Clinic
1900 Dixie Road
Unit 10
Pickering ON  L1V 6M4
Phone: (905) 839-3353
Fax: (905) 839-3391 Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DIAMONDALI KASSAMALI CHARANIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARANIA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1975

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 14 Nov 1983
Summary:

 In November 1983, Dr. Charania pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in 
 s. 60(3)(a) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1974, as amended, in that he had been found guilty of 
 an offence relevant to his suitability to practice, and as defined in s. 26(14) of Ontario 
 Regulation 577/75, as amended, in that he had charged a fee for services not performed.  The 
 Discipline Committee accepted this plea, and found Dr. Charania guilty of professional misconduct. 
  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Charania's licence to practice medicine in Ontario 
 be suspended for three months, and recommended that his name be published in the Reports of the 
 College.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 14 Nov 1983

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: March 6, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: March 6, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: QA Committee
Active Date: March 21, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

Where the Quality Assurance Committee has made a decision on or after June 1, 2016 in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”), the College By-laws require that the elements of the SCERP be posted on the register. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the Quality Assurance Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)