skip to content

Charach, Nathaniel Abram

CPSO#: 95982

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1230 North Shore Blvd E
Joseph Brant Hospital
Mental Health
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone: 905-632-3737
Fax: 905-631-0513 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

30 The Queensway
St Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Psychiatry
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: 416-530-6000
Fax: 416-530-6076
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Charach Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 08 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Charach ( CPSO# 95982 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Healthcare
Department of Psychiatry
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:15 Jul 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NATHANIEL ABRAM CHARACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARACH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 15 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2016