skip to content

Chang, Sing Yun

CPSO#: 100078

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Montreal, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. S.Y. Chang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 2 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Surrey Memorial Hospital Department of Pathology 13750 96 Avenue Surrey BC V3V 1Z2
Date Received: 31 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016