skip to content

Chang, Nina

CPSO#: 97877

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: 613-737-8899 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Nina Chang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 05 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Chang ( CPSO# 97877 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NINA CHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2018