Chang, Michelle Teresa (CPSO#: 98641)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
403 - 614 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON  N1R 3E8
Phone: 519-620-0707
Fax: 519-224-0227
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michelle Chang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 09 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chang ( CPSO# 98641 )

Business Address:
Suite 403
614 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3E8
Phone Number: (519) 620-0707

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE TERESA CHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012