skip to content

Chang, Eugene Kichung

CPSO#: 95181

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Oct 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Oct 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Rehab Institute
550 University Avenue
Room 7-131-1
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone: (416) 597-3422 Ext. 4521 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Eugene K. Chang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 09 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Chang ( CPSO# 95181 )

Business Address:
610 University Avenue
2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4501

Business Address:
Toronto Rehab Institute
Suite 7-131-1
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone Number: (416) 597-3422

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective:08 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EUGENE KICHUNG CHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 06 Jun 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
EL - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2012