skip to content

Chandy, Mark Joseph Koonthanam

CPSO#: 92582

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Oct 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Pennsylvania State University Coll of Me, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10350 Yonge Street
Lower Level Suite 002
Richmond Hill ON  L4C5K9
Phone: 905-237-5433
Fax: 905-747-1511 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Aleksandra Leligdowicz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 05 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chandy ( CPSO# 92582 )
Dr. A. Leligdowicz ( CPSO# 99315 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital-MSNICU
2nd Floor McLaughlin Room 411-Q
399 Bathurst Avenue
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5818

Business Address:
Suite 203
3601 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3R 0M3
Phone Number: (905) 604-6227

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Business Address:
602 - 500 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone Number: (416) 685-5172


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:02 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARK JOSEPH KOONTHANAM CHANDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANDY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 15 Mar 2010 to 11 Apr 2010
EL - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 26 Jul 2010 to 22 Aug 2010
EL - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 31 Dec 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2012