skip to content

Chandrasena, Samantha Helen

CPSO#: 94061

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 May 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 May 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
30 Chatham Street
Blenheim ON  N0P 1A0
Phone: (519) 676-5592 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

701 Oxford Street East
London ON  N5Y 3J8
Canada
Phone: 519-660-5199
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Samantha Chandrasena Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chandrasena ( CPSO# 94061 )

Business Address:
701 Oxford Street East
London ON  N5Y 3J8
Phone Number: (519) 660-5199

Business Address:
30 Chatham Street North
Blenheim ON  N0P 1A0
Phone Number: (519) 676-5592

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SAMANTHA HELEN CHANDRASENA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANDRASENA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jul 2010
EL - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 May 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 2014