skip to content

Chanda, Mohammed Yaameen

CPSO#: 98302

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Jul 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

47 Liberty St S
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

300-1131A Leslie St
North York ON  M3C 3L8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1000 Depalma Dr
Northumberland Hills Hospital
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Canada
Phone: 1 (905) 372-68
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mohammed Yaameen Chanda Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 08 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chanda ( CPSO# 98302 )

Business Address:
726 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z9
Phone Number: (905) 575-5743

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:31 Jul 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOHAMMED YAAMEEN CHANDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANDA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 27 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 28 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Jul 2018
CF - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2017