Chan, Veronica Hew Tung (CPSO#: 100721)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7000
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: 416-438-2911
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VERONICA HEW TUNG CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017