skip to content

Chan, Toby Yiu Bong

CPSO#: 85025

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 501
31 Kingsbury Drive
Kitchener ON  N2A 0K5
Phone: 519-208-8104
Fax: 519-208-8101 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 7
260 Holiday Inn Drive
Cambridge ON  N3C 4E8
Canada
Phone: (519) 658-6801
Fax: (519) 658-6800
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Unit 201
310 Main St E
Milton ON  L9T 1P5
Canada
Phone: 905-693-1880
Fax: 905-693-9220
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Toby Y B Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 04 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Chan ( CPSO# 85025 )

Business Address:
31 Kingsbury Drive
Suite 501
Kitchener ON  N2A 0K5
Phone Number: (416) 988-1022

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TOBY YIU BONG CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011