skip to content

Chan, Siu Kay

CPSO#: 22306

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:National Defense Medical Center, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008