skip to content

Chan, Roy Kwok-Yau

CPSO#: 30749

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Dec 1980
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wardenwood Health Centre
2361 Warden Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1T 1V7
Phone: (416) 299-4999
Fax: 416 2991322 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: K.Y. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chan ( CPSO# 30749 )

Business Address:
2361 Warden Avenue
Toronto ON  M1T 1V7
Phone Number: (416) 299-4999

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Dec 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROY KWOK-YAU CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Aug 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1980