skip to content

Chan, Lucille Shu Yee

CPSO#: 84834

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1
6 Thompson Crescent
Erin ON  N0B 1T0
Phone: (519) 833-9396
Fax: (519) 833-9838 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

100 Westmount Road
St. Joseph's Health Centre Guelph
Complex Continuing Care
Floor 2 Whispering Oaks/Floor 4 App
Guelph ON  N1H 5H8
Canada
Phone: 519-824-6000
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

115 Delhi Street
Guelph General Hospital
Family Birthing Unit
6th Floor
Guelph ON  N1E 4J8
Canada
Phone: 519 822 5350
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
St Joseph's Health Centre, Guelph Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LUCILLE SHU YEE CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008