skip to content

Chan, Loh Yen

CPSO#: 86713

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 200
491 Church Street
Toronto ON  M4Y 2C6
Phone: (416) 463-1500
Fax: (416) 463-6577 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

CAMH
60 White Squirrel Way
4th Floor
Toronto ON  M4C3E7
Canada
Phone: 416-535-8501
Fax: 416-595-6821
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: L.Y. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Chan ( CPSO# 86713 )

Business Address:
60 White Squirrel Way
4th Floor
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Business Address:
Unit 200
491 Church Street
Toronto ON  M4Y 2C6
Phone Number: (416) 463-1500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LOH YEN CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009