skip to content

Chan, Lai Fong

CPSO#: 99121

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universiti Kebangsaan Malaysia, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2012 to 14 Sep 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 15 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2013