Chan, Esther Yuen-Shan (CPSO#: 100643)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Feb 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Feb 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hospital FMTU
3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Building A, 2nd floor
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V1
Phone: 416-431-8224
Fax: 416-439-8625
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Birth Control & Sexual Health Centr
403-960 Lawrence Avenue W.
Toronto ON  M6A3B5
Canada
Phone: 416-789-4541
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: EYS Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 14 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Chan ( CPSO# 100643)

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital FMTU
2nd Floor, Building A
3000 Lawrence Avenue
Toronto ON  M1P 2V1
Phone Number: (416) 431-8224

Business Address:
M-Wing
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ESTHER YUEN-SHAN CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 23 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 Jun 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 18 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Sep 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2017