skip to content

Chan, Caroline Lee-Kwan

CPSO#: 93705

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Health Network
Emergency Department
3050 Lawrence Ave. E.
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Markham Stouffville Hospital - Mark
Department of Emergency Medicine
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Canada
Phone: 905-472-7373
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:23 Nov 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CAROLINE LEE-KWAN CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 28 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 29 Nov 2011 to 28 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 29 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Apr 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Apr 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 May 2015 to 31 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2015