Chan, Brian Pak Ho (CPSO#: 100258)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Nov 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
Division of Gastroenterology
1280 Main Street West
MUMC 2F Clinic
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: 905-525-9140
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Thunder Bay Regional Health Science
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 04 Oct 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN PAK HO CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2017