skip to content

Chan, Brian John

CPSO#: 98360

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit X2B
1149 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8H2V2
Phone: 2898602200
Fax: 2898602211 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mandy M.Y. Tam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tam ( CPSO# 95376 )
Dr. B. Chan ( CPSO# 98360 )

Business Address:
109 King Street West
Dundas ON  L9H 1V1
Phone Number: (905) 628-9200


Corporation Name: Brian J. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tam ( CPSO# 95376 )
Dr. B. Chan ( CPSO# 98360 )

Business Address:
1149 Barton St E
Unit X2B
Hamilton ON  L8H 2V2
Phone Number: 2898602200

Business Address:
826 Main Street East
Hamilton ON  L8M 1L6
Phone Number: (905) 549-6123

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRIAN JOHN CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017