skip to content

Chan, Angeline

CPSO#: 27971

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 202, 3000 Highway 7 East, Markham ON, L3R 6E1
Date Received: 01 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013