Chan, Angela Joyce (CPSO#: 100384)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Platnium Medical Clinic FHG
3170 Eglington Ave E
Toronto ON  M1J 2H3
Phone: (416) 265-2255
Fax: (416) 265-6737
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Princess Margaret hospital
610 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G2M9
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELA JOYCE CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2015 to 31 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015