skip to content

Champion, Malcolm Charles

CPSO#: 31196

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Sep 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 25 Oct 1979

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of St. Andrews, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M. Champion Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 3 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: 724 River Dr. Manotick, ON K4M 1B2
Date Received: 03 Sep 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Gastroenterology Effective:25 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective:08 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Sep 2020