skip to content

Chamia, Nabil Jean

CPSO#: 23433

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Apr 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Jan 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Cairo, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS Canada 111 St. Regis Crescent South Toronto ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: 1-888-563-3732 ext. 1
Date Received: 05 Apr 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 1971
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Apr 2016